+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 26, 2010 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1274
- Effective Date July 26, 2010
- Governor Approved
On May 28, 2010 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 29, 2010 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On April 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On April 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2010
- Second Reading
On April 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2010
- Do Pass Transportation; 007-000-000
On April 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On March 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 18, 2010
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Chapin Rose
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 008-000-000
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chapin Rose
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Provides that there shall be no fee paid for a certificate of title issued to a county when the vehicle is forfeited to the county under forfeiture provisions of the Criminal Code of 1961 (rather than limited to a forfeited junk vehicle).
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 625 ILCS 5/3-821 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 3-821
- 625 ILCS 5/4-203 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 4-203
- 720 ILCS 5/36-5 new -
+ − Votes (2)
April 29, 2010: HB5969 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 29, 2010
March 17, 2010: HB5969 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 17, 2010
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor