+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On May 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 21, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On May 15, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
On May 9, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 23, 2008
On April 18, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 9, 2008
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Availability and Access Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Availability and Access Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Health Care Availability and Access Committee
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Availability and Access Committee
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that neither the Governor nor any agency or agency head under the jurisdiction of the Governor has any rulemaking authority under the amendatory Act, but that the Governor may suggest rules by filing them with the General Assembly and requesting that the General Assembly authorize such rulemaking by law, enact the suggested rules into law, or take other appropriate action in the General Assembly's discretion.
+ − Statute Amended
- 305 ILCS 5/5-2 - from Ch. 23, par. 5-2
+ − Vote
May 15, 2008: HB5969 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 15, 2008
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor