+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 26, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1086
- Effective Date August 26, 2014
- Governor Approved
On June 27, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2014
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2014
- Second Reading
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2014
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 2, 2014
- Arrive in Senate
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 086-027-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Chair placed the bill on Standard Debate
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
- 20 ILCS 3960/3 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1153
- 20 ILCS 3960/5.3 -
- 20 ILCS 3960/5.4 -
- 20 ILCS 3960/6.2 -
- 20 ILCS 3960/8.5 -
- 20 ILCS 3960/10 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1160
- 20 ILCS 3960/11 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1161
- 20 ILCS 3960/12 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1162
- 20 ILCS 3960/12.2 -
- 20 ILCS 3960/12.5 -
- 20 ILCS 3960/13 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1163
- 20 ILCS 3960/15 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1165