+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 27, 2012 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 2, 2012 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-General Services Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor