+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 14, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On May 13, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-001-000
On April 17, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Balanced Budget Note Request is Inapplicable
- Rep. Ruth Munson/Note Inapplicable; 105-000-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Kurt M. Granberg
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Approp-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 015-001-002
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Approp-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard P. Myers
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brent Hassert
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ruth Munson
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2008: HB5956 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 13, 2008
March 13, 2008: HB5956 - Motion - Thursday, March 13, 2008
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor