+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On May 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 13, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On May 8, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
On April 18, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 9, 2008
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Human Services Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ruth Munson
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that there is no rulemaking authority under the Act, but that the Governor may suggest rules by filing them with the General Assembly and requesting that the General Assembly authorize such rulemaking by law, enact the suggested rules into law, or take other appropriate action in the General Assembly's discretion.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Vote
May 8, 2008: HB5950 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 08, 2008
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor