+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 14, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Remains in State Government Administration Committee
- Motion Do Pass - Lost State Government Administration Committee; 005-007-000
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron Schock
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jil Tracy
+ − Statute Amended
- 30 ILCS 105/8.3 - from Ch. 127, par. 144.3