+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (58)
On November 17, 2016 in the House:
- Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
On November 16, 2016 in the House:
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Override Governor Veto - House Lost 064-042-000
On November 15, 2016 in the House:
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Robyn Gabel
On November 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Total Veto
On August 26, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Vetoed
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 040-018-000
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2016
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Do Pass Human Services; 006-003-000
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Linda Holmes
- Waive Posting Notice
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-043-000
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Balanced Budget Note Filed
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed
- Judicial Note Filed
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Correctional Note Filed
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- State Debt Impact Note Filed
- State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Robyn Gabel
- Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Robyn Gabel
- Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Robyn Gabel
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Robyn Gabel
- Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Robyn Gabel
- Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Robyn Gabel
- Pension Note Filed
- Home Rule Note Filed
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Fiscal Note Filed
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Ed Sullivan
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Ed Sullivan
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 011-008-000
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (5)
November 16, 2016: HB5931 - Motion
May 31, 2016: HB5931 - Third Reading
May 24, 2016: HB5931 - Human Services
May 18, 2016: HB5931 - Third Reading
April 13, 2016: HB5931 - Appropriations-Human Services
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor