+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 18, 2008 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0743
- Effective Date January 1, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 18, 2008 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2008 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2008
- Second Reading
On May 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2008
- Do Pass Environment and Energy; 009-000-000
On May 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Environment and Energy
On May 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 3, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-001-000
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 013-000-000
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ruth Munson
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sandy Cole
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2008: HB5930 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 20, 2008
April 1, 2008: HB5930 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 01, 2008
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor