+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (53)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On August 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On July 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Denny Jacobs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Denny Jacobs
On July 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading July 2, 2004
- Second Reading
On June 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading July 1, 2004
- Do Pass Insurance & Pensions; 006-004-000
On June 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Held in Insurance & Pensions
On June 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance & Pensions
- Waive Posting Notice
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 082-030-003
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Jack McGuire
On March 26, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Balanced Budget Note Filed As Amended by HA 2
- Balanced Budget Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- Pension Note Filed
- Judicial Note Filed
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Pension Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Pension Note Filed As Amended by HA 2
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed As Amended by HA 1,2
- Home Rule Note Filed As Amended by HA 1,2
- Judicial Note Filed As Amended by HA 1,2
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Pension Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
On March 19, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino
On March 12, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 011-000-001
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Insurance Committee
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance Committee
On February 6, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Repeals the Small Employer Group Health Insurance Law of the Illinois Insurance Code. Creates the Illinois Consumer Choice of Benefits Health Insurance Plan Act. Provides that insurers and employers may offer policies of accident and health insurance that do not provide state-mandated health benefits. Effective immediately.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Repeals the Small Employer Group Health Insurance Law of the Illinois Insurance Code. Creates the Illinois Consumer Choice of Benefits Health Insurance Plan Act. Provides that insurers and employers may offer policies of accident and health insurance that do not provide state-mandated health benefits. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Vote
March 30, 2004: HB5925 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 30, 2004
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor