+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (36)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 014-000-000
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed
- Home Rule Note Filed
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
- Correctional Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
- Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
- Judicial Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
- Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
- Pension Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
- State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
- Balanced Budget Note Filed
- Judicial Note Filed
- Pension Note Filed
- State Debt Impact Note Filed
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-006-000
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
April 22, 2021: HFA0001 - Human Services
March 9, 2021: HB0591 - Human Services
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor