+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On April 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 17, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On April 15, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by International Trade & Commerce Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in International Trade & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate International Trade & Commerce Committee; 008-000-000
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to International Trade & Commerce Committee
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brent Hassert
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ruth Munson
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ronald A. Wait
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that neither the Governor nor any agency or agency head under the jurisdiction of the Governor has any rulemaking authority under the amendatory Act, but that the Governor may suggest rules by filing them with the General Assembly and requesting that the General Assembly authorize such rulemaking by law, enact the suggested rules into law, or take other appropriate action in the General Assembly's discretion.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
April 15, 2008: HB5906 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 15, 2008
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor