+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On August 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, extended to January 11, 2005.
On May 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2004
- Second Reading
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 29, 2004
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
On April 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Debbie DeFrancesco Halvorson
On April 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On April 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 20, 2004
- Arrive in Senate
On April 2, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-049-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
On April 1, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 26, 2004 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 6, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Physical Fitness Services Act. Provides that no contract for physical fitness services shall require payment of a total amount in excess of $4500 (rather than $2500) per year. Effective immediately.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Physical Fitness Services Act. Provides that no contract for physical fitness services shall require payment of a total amount in excess of $4500 (rather than $2500) per year. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 815 ILCS 505/12 - from Ch. 121 1/2, par. 272
+ − Vote
April 2, 2004: HB5875 - Third Reading - Friday, April 02, 2004
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor