+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On March 21, 2021 in the House:
- To Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 720 ILCS 5/2-23 new
- 720 ILCS 5/19-2 - from Ch. 38, par. 19-2
- 720 ILCS 5/19-2.5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor