+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 30, 2004 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 29, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joseph M. Lyons
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Financial Institutions Committee; 016-000-000
On April 20, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On April 2, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joseph M. Lyons
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 2, 2004
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 6, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 205 ILCS 105/1-1 - from Ch. 17, par. 3301-1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor