+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 20, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On May 13, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 12, 2008 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On May 9, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 23, 2008
On May 6, 2008 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rich Brauer
On April 29, 2008 in the House:
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 18, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 9, 2008
On April 16, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 8, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Local Government Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Local Government Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Local Government Committee
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rich Brauer
- Assigned to Local Government Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 18, 2008
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. In a Section concerning veterans' preference, provides that "active duty military or naval service of the United States" includes full-time training duty, annual training duty, and attendance while in the active military service at a school designated as a service school.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. In a Section concerning veterans' preference, provides that "active duty military or naval service of the United States" includes full-time training duty, annual training duty, and attendance while in the active military service at a school designated as a service school.
+ − Statute Amended
- 65 ILCS 5/10-2.1-10 - from Ch. 24, par. 10-2.1-10