+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 017-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the provisions of the introduced bill, and makes the following changes: (1) changes references to "floating object" to "dock"; (2) deletes language providing that the floating object be required to have a navigational, informational, or regulatory purpose; (3) provides that a dock shall be equipped with reflector tape, or any other reflective material or equipment, in such a manner it can be seen by an approaching boat (rather than from any direction); and (4) deletes language providing that a floating object placed 100 feet or more from shore shall be equipped with a fixed white light.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
April 24, 2018: HFA0002 - Agriculture & Conservation
April 9, 2018: HB5832 - Agriculture & Conservation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor