+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 3, 2009 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
- Third Reading - Consideration Postponed
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
On March 27, 2009 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John A. Fritchey
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John A. Fritchey
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John A. Fritchey
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 011-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Sacia
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 011-002-000
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Sacia
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Amends the Illinois Horse Meat Act and the State Finance Act. Creates the Equine Rescue Assistance Fund as a special fund in the State Treasury. Provides that certain federally inspected facilities that produce horse meat shall collect a fee of $25 for every horse slaughtered. Provides that these fees shall be remitted to the Department and then deposited by the Department into the Equine Rescue Assistance Fund. Requires the Department to create and administer an Equine Rescue Assistance Program. Provides that, subject to appropriation, the Department may make grants to qualified equine rescue organizations for the expansion of equine rescue facilities and for the care and maintenance of rescued horses.
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 225 ILCS 635/13.1 new -
- 225 ILCS 635/1.5 rep. -
- 410 ILCS 605/2.1 - from Ch. 8, par. 107.1
- 510 ILCS 65/4 - from Ch. 8, par. 954
- 510 ILCS 70/5 - from Ch. 8, par. 705
- 510 ILCS 70/7.5 -
- 510 ILCS 75/2 - from Ch. 8, par. 229.52
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor