+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On July 2, 2018 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 017-001-000
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
+ − Vote
May 15, 2018: HB5828 - Approp-Elementary & Secondary Educ
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor