+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On May 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On May 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Deanna Demuzio
- Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs
On April 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Deanna Demuzio
On March 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On March 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 21, 2007
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 2, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Veterans Affairs Committee; 012-000-000
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 20, 2007: HB0579 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 20, 2007
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor