+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 16, 2005 in the House:
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Wyvetter H. Younge
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur L. Turner
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Washington
On March 10, 2005 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 105 ILCS 5/10-21.9 - from Ch. 122, par. 10-21.9
- 105 ILCS 5/34-18.5 - from Ch. 122, par. 34-18.5
- 210 ILCS 85/10.9 new -
- 325 ILCS 5/11.1 - from Ch. 23, par. 2061.1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor