+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (53)
- Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
- Placed on Calendar Total Veto
- Governor Vetoed
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Passed; 037-019-000
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2016
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Do Pass Human Services; 005-003-000
- Assigned to Human Services
- Waive Posting Notice
- Senator Connelly request a Roll Call Vote on the Motion to Waive Posting Notice - 033-011-000
- Waive Posting Notice
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-041-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ed Sullivan
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ed Sullivan
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 011-008-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. In a provision concerning the Community Care Program, establishes the following rate increases for the purpose of increasing the wages paid by vendors to their employees who provide homemaker services: on July 1, 2016, rates shall be increased to $19.23 per hour, for the purpose of increasing wages by at least $1.25 per hour; on July 1, 2017, rates shall be increased to $21.32 per hour, for the purpose of increasing wages by at least $1.25 per hour; on July 1, 2018, rates shall be increased to $23.41 per hour, for the purpose of increasing wages by at least $1.25 per hour; and on July 1, 2019, rates shall be increased to $25.08 per hour, for the purpose of increasing wages by at least $1 per hour. Requires the Department to pay an enhanced rate under the Community Care Program to those in-home service provider agencies that offer health insurance coverage as a benefit to their direct service worker employees consistent with the mandates of Public Act 95-713; and that for State fiscal year 2017, the enhanced rate shall be $1.77 per hour and shall be adjusted using actuarial analysis based on the cost of care, but shall not be set below $1.77 per hour. Effective July 1, 2016.
+ − Statute Amended
- 20 ILCS 105/4.02 - from Ch. 23, par. 6104.02