+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On April 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 8, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-002-000
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Approp-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 012-001-000
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Approp-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rich Brauer