+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 008-006-000
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Ed Sullivan
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Ed Sullivan
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 011-008-000
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Adds provisions requiring the Department of Human Services to provide mandatory annual trainings covering health and safety matters appropriate to a home-based setting for non-relative providers in the child care assistance program. Provides that relative providers shall be encouraged, but not required, to attend mandatory annual trainings; and that both non-relative and relative providers shall be paid $15 per hour for their attendance at such trainings. Adds provisions concerning the locations of the mandatory annual trainings, notice requirements, and online training.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
April 14, 2016: HFA0001 - Human Services
April 13, 2016: HB5763 - Appropriations-Human Services
+ − Sponsors (52)
Type:
Primary Sponsor