+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016
On May 27, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Fiscal Note Filed
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Ed Sullivan
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Ed Sullivan
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 011-008-000
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
+ − Statute Amended
- 20 ILCS 2405/3 - from Ch. 23, par. 3434
+ − Vote
April 13, 2016: HB5762 - Appropriations-Human Services
+ − Sponsors (54)
Type:
Primary Sponsor