+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On August 13, 2015 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0355
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 13, 2015
On August 12, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On August 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 049-002-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On August 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading August 5, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading August 5, 2015
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As August 5, 2015
On July 28, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-001-000
On July 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 31, 2015
On May 31, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2015
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 15, 2015
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the General Assembly Compensation Act. Establishes the fiscal year 2016 mileage reimbursement rate and allowance for lodging and meals. Amends the Compensation Review Act. Prohibits cost-of-living adjustments for or during the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2015 for State government legislative and executive elected officers and appointees in positions for which the Compensation Review Board previously recommended or determined compensation. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 15 ILCS 520/4 - from Ch. 130, par. 23
- 25 ILCS 115/1 - from Ch. 63, par. 14
- 25 ILCS 120/6.3 new -
+ − Votes (3)
August 5, 2015: HB0576 - Third Reading - Wednesday, August 05, 2015
July 28, 2015: HB0576 - Third Reading - Tuesday, July 28, 2015
April 14, 2015: HB0576 - Executive - Apr 14, 2015
+ − Sponsors (79)
Type:
Primary Sponsor