+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell