+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 10, 2005 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 3, 2005 in the House:
- Remains in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Motion Do Pass - Lost Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 006-007-001
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert S. Molaro
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 430 ILCS 65/8 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-8
- 720 ILCS 5/24-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 24-1
- 720 ILCS 5/24-1.1 - from Ch. 38, par. 24-1.1
- 720 ILCS 5/24-1.6 -
- 720 ILCS 5/24-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 24-3
- 720 ILCS 5/24-3.1 - from Ch. 38, par. 24-3.1
- 720 ILCS 5/24-4.1 new -