+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On August 28, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0482
- Effective Date August 28, 2007
- Governor Approved
On June 29, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On June 1, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 108-000-000
On May 31, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 8, 2007
On May 30, 2007 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 009-000-000
On May 28, 2007 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On May 21, 2007 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Ruth Munson
On May 16, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2007
- Second Reading
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive
- Do Pass as Amended Executive; 010-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2007
On May 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
On March 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On March 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 7, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 014-000-000
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ruth Munson
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the Task Force shall also include one member representing the Office of the State Comptroller, appointed by the Comptroller, and one member representing school administrators, appointed by the State Superintendent of Education.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
June 1, 2007: SCA0001 - Concurrence - Friday, June 01, 2007
May 16, 2007: HB0574 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 16, 2007
March 1, 2007: HB0574 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 01, 2007
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor