+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 23, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2022
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0130
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 098-009-001
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Civil Committee; 016-000-000
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 710 ILCS 20/3 - from Ch. 37, par. 853
- 710 ILCS 20/4 - from Ch. 37, par. 854
+ − Votes (5)
May 25, 2021: HB0574 - Third Reading
May 11, 2021: HB0574 - Judiciary
April 16, 2021: HB0574
April 16, 2021: HB0574 - Third Reading
March 9, 2021: HB0574 - Judiciary - Civil
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor