+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0995
- Effective Date August 23, 2004
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-001-001
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Revenue Committee; 009-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue Committee
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-002-000
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Steve Davis
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, extended to January 11, 2005.
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Link
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Rules
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 29, 2004
- Second Reading
- Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Assigned to Revenue
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Fiscal Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue Committee; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Revenue Committee
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote
- Re-assigned to Revenue Committee
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Steve Davis
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything. Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act in the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that the redevelopment project in the TIF District created by an ordinance adopted on November 30, 1986 by the City of Effingham must be completed by December 31 of the 35th year (now, the 23rd year) after the year in which the ordinance was adopted. Effective immediately.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything. Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act in the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that the redevelopment project in the TIF District created by an ordinance adopted on November 30, 1986 by the City of Effingham must be completed by December 31 of the 35th year (now, the 23rd year) after the year in which the ordinance was adopted. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 65 ILCS 5/11-74.4-1 - from Ch. 24, par. 11-74.4-1