+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On May 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On May 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Held in Executive
On May 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive
On May 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno
On March 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On March 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Christine Radogno
On March 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
On March 2, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 014-000-000
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Remains in Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ruth Munson
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill. Removes a Section from the introduced bill that prohibits the filing of certain documents with a recorder of deeds or circuit court clerk if the document contains a social security number.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill. Removes a Section from the introduced bill that prohibits the filing of certain documents with a recorder of deeds or circuit court clerk if the document contains a social security number.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
March 8, 2007: HB0573 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 08, 2007
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor