+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Frank J. Mautino
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino
On March 25, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary K. O'Brien
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 730 ILCS 5/3-2-5 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-2-5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor