+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (52)
On August 5, 2003 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0419
- Effective Date January 1, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 27, 2003 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2003 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs in SA 3
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 117-000-000
On May 28, 2003 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 010-000-000
On May 23, 2003 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2003
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joe Dunn
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Joe Dunn; Motion #1
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
On May 20, 2003 in the House:
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3
- Arrived in House
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2003
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Harmon
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
On May 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Judiciary; 009-000-000
On May 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
On May 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Luechtefeld
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2003
- Second Reading
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 007-004-000
On April 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On April 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2003
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 068-044-005
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate **
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary K. O'Brien
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/9-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 9-1
+ − Votes (3)
May 29, 2003: SFA0003 - Concurrence - Thursday, May 29, 2003
May 16, 2003: HB0571 - Third Reading - Friday, May 16, 2003
April 3, 2003: HB0571 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 03, 2003
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor