+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 16, 2008 in the House:
- Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 010-003-000
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/3-5 - from Ch. 38, par. 3-5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor