+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Ethics & Elections Committee
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 10 ILCS 5/7-10.2 - from Ch. 46, par. 7-10.2
- 10 ILCS 5/7-17 - from Ch. 46, par. 7-17
- 10 ILCS 5/8-8.1 - from Ch. 46, par. 8-8.1
- 10 ILCS 5/10-5.1 - from Ch. 46, par. 10-5.1
- 10 ILCS 5/16-3 - from Ch. 46, par. 16-3
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor