+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On November 29, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- To Income Tax Subcommittee
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Jonathan Carroll
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll
+ − Statute Amended
- 35 ILCS 5/1501 - from Ch. 120, par. 15-1501
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor