+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (54)
On July 18, 2003 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0207
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2004
On June 27, 2003 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2003 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs in SA 3
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 113-000-003
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 012-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mary K. O'Brien; Motion #1
On May 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Obama
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Barack Obama
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Judiciary; 010-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
On May 30, 2003 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On May 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On May 30, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2003
On May 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Barack Obama
On May 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Barack Obama
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, to December 31, 2003.
On May 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2003
- Second Reading
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 007-004-000
On April 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On April 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 068-045-004
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate **
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Mary K. O'Brien
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary K. O'Brien
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary K. O'Brien
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/7-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 7-1