+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 18, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0998
- Effective Date August 18, 2014
- Governor Approved
On June 20, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2014
- Second Reading
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2014
- Do Pass Higher Education; 009-000-000
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Higher Education
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 25, 2014
- Arrive in Senate
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-002-000
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine Hammond