+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Statute Amended
- 215 ILCS 5/357.29 - from Ch. 73, par. 969.29
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor