+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 23, 2010 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1242
- Effective Date July 23, 2010
- Governor Approved
On May 26, 2010 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 27, 2010 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On April 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
On April 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2010
- Second Reading
On April 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 23, 2010
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000
On April 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Held in Criminal Law
On April 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On March 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On March 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 15, 2010
- Arrive in Senate
On March 12, 2010 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Careen M. Gordon