+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
- Session Sine Die
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2008
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 23, 2008
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 9, 2008
- Remains in Human Services Committee
- Motion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Human Services Committee; 004-004-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Human Services Committee
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 18, 2008
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tom Cross
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Alternative Health Care Delivery Act and the Hospital Licensing Act. Provides that there shall be no more than the total postsurgical recovery care centers with certificate of need for beds as of January 1, 2008 (instead of a total of 12 centers); deletes provisions concerning specific locations of postsurgical recovery care centers. Repeals a provision that once the Department of Public Health has authorized a total of 12 postsurgical recovery care centers, no new centers shall be authorized for the duration of the demonstration program. Provides that for purposes of the Hospital Licensing Act, "hospital" includes postsurgical recovery care hospitals, and provides for the licensing of such hospitals. Eliminates obsolete provisions and makes other changes. Effective July 1, 2008.