+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/2-3.17a - from Ch. 122, par. 2-3.17a