+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 26, 2010 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 25, 2010 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Watson
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Watson
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jim Watson
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor