+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 1, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Re-Referred to Rules Committee
On May 23, 2003 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2003
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Joe Dunn; Motion #1
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joe Dunn
On May 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 9, 2003 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
On May 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2003
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Judiciary; 010-000-000
On May 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2003
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 007-004-000
On April 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On April 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 068-045-004
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate **
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary K. O'Brien
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes all. Amends the Criminal Code of 1961 and the Unified Code of Corrections. Eliminates the distinction between family members and non-family members who commit the offenses of criminal sexual assault or aggravated criminal sexual abuse. Provides that the penalties for these offenses shall be the same if the offender held a position of trust, authority, or supervision in relation to the victim. Restores provisions of the offenses of criminal sexual assault and aggravated criminal sexual abuse relating to an offender who is in a position of trust, authority, or supervision in relation to a victim who is at least 13 years of age but under 18 years of age when the offense was committed.
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/5-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 5-1
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2003: HB0562 - Third Reading - Friday, May 09, 2003
April 3, 2003: HB0562 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 03, 2003
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor