+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On August 15, 2016 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0811
- Effective Date August 15, 2016
- Governor Approved
On June 27, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 117-000-000
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Cities & Villages Committee; 007-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Cities & Villages Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2016
- Second Reading
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2016
- Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 007-000-000
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
- Assigned to Local Government
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 007-000-000
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Adds provisions allowing a fire chief to refer matters to the State's Attorney when a person fails to comply with the fire chief's orders enforcing the provisions of the Fire Investigation Act.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (7)
May 31, 2016: SCA0001 - Concurrence
May 26, 2016: SCA0001 - Cities & Villages
May 25, 2016: HB5611 - Third Reading
May 4, 2016: HB5611 - Local Government
May 4, 2016: SCA0001 - Local Government
April 7, 2016: HB5611 - Third Reading
April 4, 2016: HB5611 - Cities & Villages
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor