+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On July 20, 2018 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0611
- Effective Date July 20, 2018
- Governor Approved
On June 19, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
- Second Reading
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
- Do Pass State Government; 006-000-000
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
On April 20, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 011-000-000
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; by Voice Vote
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
On March 30, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (36)
- New Act -
- 20 ILCS 5/5-10 - was 20 ILCS 5/2.1
- 20 ILCS 5/5-15 - was 20 ILCS 5/3
- 20 ILCS 5/5-20 - was 20 ILCS 5/4
- 20 ILCS 5/5-195 new -
- 20 ILCS 5/5-357 new -
- 20 ILCS 5/5-605 - was 20 ILCS 5/12
- 20 ILCS 405/405-10 - was 20 ILCS 405/35.3
- 20 ILCS 405/405-270 - was 20 ILCS 405/67.18
- 20 ILCS 405/405-410 -
- 20 ILCS 405/405-20 rep. -
- 20 ILCS 405/405-250 rep. -
- 20 ILCS 405/405-255 rep. -
- 20 ILCS 405/405-260 rep. -
- 20 ILCS 405/405-265 rep. -
- 20 ILCS 605/605-680 -
- 20 ILCS 605/605-1007 -
- 20 ILCS 2905/2.5 -
- 20 ILCS 3921/5 -
- 20 ILCS 3921/7 new -
- 20 ILCS 3921/10 -
- 20 ILCS 3921/15 -
- 20 ILCS 3921/20 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/6p-1 - from Ch. 127, par. 142p1
- 30 ILCS 105/6p-2 - from Ch. 127, par. 142p2
- 30 ILCS 105/8.16a - from Ch. 127, par. 144.16a
- 30 ILCS 105/8.16b - from Ch. 127, par. 144.16b
- 30 ILCS 500/20-60 -
- 30 ILCS 707/10 -
- 40 ILCS 5/1-160 -
- 40 ILCS 5/14-110 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 14-110
- 40 ILCS 5/15-106 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 15-106
- 225 ILCS 732/1-110 -
- 305 ILCS 5/12-10.10 -
- 720 ILCS 649/20 -
- 40 ILCS 5/14-152.1 -
+ − Votes (5)
May 21, 2018: HB5611 - Third Reading
May 9, 2018: HB5611 - State Government
April 23, 2018: HB5611 - Third Reading
April 12, 2018: HFA0004 - Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT
April 11, 2018: HB5611 - Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor