+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 1, 2008 in the House:
- Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Rep. Rosemary Mulligan
On March 14, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Remains in Insurance Committee
- Motion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Insurance Committee; 008-007-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Insurance Committee
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Insurance Committee
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rosemary Mulligan
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that there is no rulemaking authority under the amendatory Act, but that the Governor may suggest rules by filing them with the General Assembly and requesting that the General Assembly authorize such rulemaking by law, enact the suggested rules into law, or take other appropriate action in the General Assembly's discretion.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 215 ILCS 5/356z.11 new -
- 215 ILCS 125/5-3 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1411.2
- 215 ILCS 165/10 - from Ch. 32, par. 604
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor