+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 13, 2009 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 7, 2009 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. David Reis
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 15 ILCS 205/1 - from Ch. 14, par. 1
- 15 ILCS 205/3 - from Ch. 14, par. 3
- 15 ILCS 205/4 - from Ch. 14, par. 4
- 15 ILCS 205/4a - from Ch. 14, par. 4a
- 15 ILCS 205/6 - from Ch. 14, par. 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor