+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On April 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On April 3, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 014-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rosemary Mulligan
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts House Bill 5599 as introduced with the following addition: Requires the Court to rule on Line of Duty Compensation Act claims within one year after the claim application is filed by the Attorney General. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 705 ILCS 505/8 - from Ch. 37, par. 439.8
+ − Vote
April 3, 2008: HB5599 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 03, 2008
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor